Home > Sovereign Bank > History
Sovereign Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Sovereign Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1984-10-29 | Institution established: Original name:The First Oklahoma Bank, National Association | |
1995-03-24 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1995-10-01 | Changed name to First National Bank and Trust Company | |
2006-07-29 | Acquired The Guarantee State Bank (9470) in LAWTON, OK | |
2021-07-18 | Acquired The First State BankFirst National Bank and Trust Company (17884) in OKLAHOMA CITY, OK. |