SouthStar Bank, S.S.B., History

The following are a list of major historical events for SouthStar Bank, S.S.B., including mergers and acquisitions.

1920-11-06Institution established: Original name:Farmers & Merchants State Bank
1981-02-26Changed name to Moulton State Bank
1987-07-02Acquired Bank of Brazoria (18279) in BRAZORIA, TX
1990-06-27Changed name to First State Bank
2002-01-01Changed name to Lone Star Bank
2004-08-01Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
2004-08-01Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK
2004-08-01Changed name to Lone Star Bank, S.S.B.
2015-01-01Changed name to SouthStar Bank, S.S.B.
2015-01-01Acquired Texas Star Bank, SSB (16218) in LOTT, TX
2015-01-01Acquired First Star Bank, S.S.B. (1176) in BREMOND, TX