Southern Bank and Trust Company, History

The following are major historical events for Southern Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.

1901-01-01Institution established: Original name:Bank of Mount Olive
1967-03-01Changed name to Southern Bank and Trust Company
1973-10-01Acquired Merchants & Farmers Bank (11854) in MACCLESFIELD, NC
1986-12-29Acquired Tarheel Bank & Trust Co. (14544) in GATESVILLE, NC
1993-07-10Acquired Citizens Savings Bank, Inc. (28140) in ROCKY MOUNT, NC
1998-05-15Acquired Enfield Savings Bank, Inc., SSB (28313) in ENFIELD, NC
2011-09-23Acquired Bank of the Commonwealth (20408) in NORFOLK, VA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2013-07-01Acquired The Heritage Bank (8939) in LUCAMA, NC
2016-02-01Acquired Heritage Bank (22411) in NORFOLK, VA