Home > Southern Bank > History
Southern Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Southern Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1887-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Southern Missouri Savings and Loan Association | |
1982-09-30 | Acquired Pioneer State Savings and Loan Association (30947) in VAN BUREN, MO | |
1983-03-31 | Acquired Kennett Savings and Loan Association (31324) in KENNETT, MO | |
1991-06-19 | Changed name to Southern Missouri Savings Bank | |
1994-04-13 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
1995-06-20 | Changed name to Southern Missouri Savings Bank, FSB | |
1995-06-20 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1998-02-17 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1998-02-17 | Changed name to Southern Missouri Bank & Trust Co. | |
2004-06-28 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2004-06-28 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2009-06-01 | Changed name to Southern Bank | |
2009-07-20 | Acquired Southern Bank of Commerce (35335) in PARAGOULD, AR | |
2009-11-16 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2009-11-16 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2010-12-17 | Acquired First Southern Bank (58052) in BATESVILLE, AR as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2013-10-05 | Acquired Bank of Thayer (12474) in THAYER, MO | |
2014-02-21 | Acquired Citizens State Bank (8727) in BALD KNOB, AR | |
2014-12-06 | Acquired Peoples Bank of the Ozarks (1650) in NIXA, MO | |
2017-06-19 | Acquired Capaha Bank, SB (17524) in TAMMS, IL | |
2018-02-24 | Acquired Southern Missouri Bank of Marshfield (34445) in MARSHFIELD, MO | |
2018-12-08 | Acquired First Commercial Bank (10621) in GIDEON, MO | |
2020-05-23 | Acquired Central Federal Savings and Loan Association of Rolla (30664) in ROLLA, MO |