Home > SouthEast Bank > History
SouthEast Bank, History
The following are major historical events for SouthEast Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
2002-04-29 | Institution established: Original name:SouthEast Bank & Trust | |
2013-03-01 | Acquired COMMUNITY BANK OF THE CUMBERLANDS (57111) in JAMESTOWN, TN | |
2013-05-29 | Changed name to SouthEast Bank | |
2014-11-25 | Moved bank headquarters from ATHENS, TN to FARRAGUT, TN | |
2014-11-26 | Moved bank headquarters from FARRAGUT, TN to ATHENS, TN | |
2015-01-21 | Moved bank headquarters from ATHENS, TN to FARRAGUT, TN |