Home > Solutions Bank > History
Solutions Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Solutions Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1887-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Forreston State Bank | |
1991-11-01 | Reorganized. | |
2014-11-01 | Acquired Kent Bank (12704) in KENT, IL | |
2020-09-18 | Acquired The Poplar Grove State Bank (16483) in POPLAR GROVE, IL | |
2020-09-18 | Changed name to Solutions Bank | |
2022-01-29 | Acquired Durand State BankSolutions Bank (17713) in DURAND, IL. |