Home > SimplyBank. > History
SimplyBank., History
The following are major historical events for SimplyBank., including mergers and acquisitions.
1890-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Hamilton Bank of Rhea County | |
1976-02-27 | Changed name to Bank of Rhea County | |
1976-08-04 | Changed name to Liberty Bank of Tennessee - Rhea County | |
1981-06-01 | Changed name to United American Bank in Rhea County | |
1982-06-09 | Changed name to City & County Bank of Rhea County | |
1983-12-08 | Changed name to First Bank of Rhea County | |
1999-08-01 | Changed name to First Bank of Tennessee | |
2004-12-31 | Acquired Peoples Bank of Polk County (21563) in BENTON, TN | |
2018-10-06 | Changed name to Simply Bank | |
2021-03-19 | Acquired Community National BankSimply Bank (19272) in DAYTON, TN. | |
2021-03-22 | Moved bank headquarters from 369 FRONT STREET, SPRING CITY, TN to 420 Third Ave, Dayton, TN. |