Silicon Valley Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 03/10/2023 |
Absorption - Assisted | |
Successor Bank: | Deposit Insurance National Bank of Santa Clara |
Headquarters: | Silicon Valley Bank 3003 Tasman Dr Santa Clara, CA 95054 |
Established: | 10/17/1983 |
FDIC Insurance: | 10/17/1983 |
FDIC Cert: | #24735 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed member, supervised by the Federal Reserve (FRB) |
Total Assets: | $209,026,000,000 |
Total Deposits: | $175,378,000,000 |
History
1983-10-17 | Institution established: Original name:Silicon Valley Bank | |
1986-12-02 | Moved bank headquarters from SAN JOSE, CA to SANTA CLARA, CA | |
1986-12-02 | Acquired National InterCity Bank (24680) in SANTA CLARA, CA | |
2021-07-01 | Acquired Boston Private Bank & Trust CompanySilicon Valley Bank (24811) in Boston, MA. | |
2023-03-10 | Failed. Acquired with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Deposit Insurance National Bank of Santa Clara (59331) | |
2023-03-13 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Silicon Valley Bridge Bank, National Association (59334) | |
2023-03-26 | Failed. Acquired with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (11063) |