SENB Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 10/21/2023 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | CBI Bank & Trust |
Headquarters: | SENB Bank 3535 Avenue Of The Cities Moline, IL 61265 |
Established: | 12/17/1999 |
FDIC Insurance: | 12/17/1999 |
FDIC Cert: | #35109 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $331,627,000 |
Total Deposits: | $273,244,000 |
History
1999-12-17 | Acquired Southeast National Bank of Moline (18419) in MOLINE, IL | |
1999-12-17 | Institution established: Original name:Southeast National Bank | |
2000-02-24 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2014-09-15 | Acquired Buffalo Savings Bank (219) in BUFFALO, IA | |
2017-12-26 | Moved bank headquarters from DAVENPORT, IA to MOLINE, IL | |
2017-12-27 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2017-12-27 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2017-12-27 | Changed name to SENB Bank | |
2019-04-01 | Acquired Gateway Community Bank (57275) in ROSCOE, IL |