Home > Security State Bank & Trust > History
Security State Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for Security State Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1941-04-07 | Institution established: Original name:Security State Bank | |
1961-07-26 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1962-06-11 | Changed name to Security State Bank and Trust | |
1988-06-16 | Acquired Kingsland National Bank (24345) in KINGSLAND, TX | |
1989-01-12 | Acquired First State Bank (13440) in HARPER, TX | |
2010-03-17 | Changed name to Security State Bank & Trust |