Home > Security Savings Bank > History
Security Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Security Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1920-06-14 | Institution established: Original name:Security Savings Bank | |
1985-02-19 | Acquired Inwood State Bank (16248) in INWOOD, IA | |
2007-04-16 | Acquired George State Bank (14842) in GEORGE, IA | |
2014-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from LARCHWOOD, IA to CANTON, SD | |
2014-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
2019-01-14 | Acquired Exchange State Bank (8212) in LUVERNE, MN |