Home > Security Bank > History

Security Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Security Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1931-01-01Institution established: Original name:Newbern State Bank
1968-11-06Changed name to Security State Bank
1986-01-09Reorganized.
1988-07-30Changed name to Security Bank
1990-06-15Acquired Century Federal Savings Bank (29718) in TRENTON, TN
2002-07-15Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2002-07-15Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD