Santander Bank, N.A., History

The following are a list of major historical events for Santander Bank, N.A., including mergers and acquisitions.

1907-01-01Institution established: Original name:New Home Federal Savings and Loan Association
1976-07-31Acquired New Home Savings and Loan Association (31021) in READING, PA
1981-08-31Acquired First Federal Savings and Loan Association (30274) in ALLENTOWN, PA
1984-01-31Acquired First Federal Savings and Loan Association (30240) in LANCASTER, PA
1984-02-29Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK
1984-02-29Changed name to Penn Savings Bank FSB
1986-12-31Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
1991-08-23Acquired Nassau Federal Savings and Loan Association (32982) in PRINCETON, NJ
1991-09-06Acquired United Savings and Loan Association of Trenton, F.A. (33083) in TRENTON, NJ
1991-12-31Changed name to Sovereign Bank, A Federal Savings Bank
1991-12-31Acquired Yardley Bank for Savings, FSB (28320) in YARDLEY, PA
1992-09-11Acquired Jersey Shore Savings and Loan Association (30236) in TOMS RIVER, NJ
1993-01-16Acquired Harmonia Savings Bank (16610) in ELIZABETH, NJ
1993-08-27Acquired Home Unity Federal Savings and Loan Association (33605) in LAFAYETTE HILL, PA as part of a government assisted transaction.
1993-11-06Acquired Valley Federal Savings and Loan Association (27687) in EASTON, PA
1994-08-05Acquired Shadow Lawn Savings Bank, SLA (30042) in LONG BRANCH, NJ
1994-10-31Acquired Charter Federal Savings Bank (30653) in RANDOLPH TOWNSHIP, NJ
1996-05-31Acquired West Jersey Community Bank (32913) in FAIRFIELD, NJ
1996-12-23Changed name to Sovereign Bank
1997-02-19Acquired First Dewitt Bank (30198) in WEST CALDWELL, NJ
1997-03-31Acquired Sovereign Community Bank (27323) in FREEHOLD, NJ
1997-08-30Acquired Bankers Savings (12029) in PERTH AMBOY, NJ
1998-03-01Acquired Main Line Bank (29628) in VILLANOVA, PA
1998-07-31Acquired First Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. (31771) in PENNSVILLE, NJ
1998-07-31Acquired Carnegie Bank, National Association (27194) in LANGHORNE, PA
1999-06-30Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
1999-06-30Acquired Trenton Savings Bank FSB (12009) in LAWRENCEVILLE, NJ
2002-03-08Acquired Main Street Bank (27104) in READING, PA
2002-05-03Acquired Sovereign Trust Company (33208) in MANCHESTER TOWNSHIP, NJ
2004-02-06Acquired First Essex Bank (90219) in LAWRENCE, MA
2004-07-23Acquired Nantucket Bank (22055) in NANTUCKET, MA
2004-07-23Acquired Compass Bank for Savings (23291) in NEW BEDFORD, MA
2005-02-11Acquired Waypoint Bank (30174) in HARRISBURG, PA
2006-09-09Acquired Independence Community Bank (16018) in BROOKLYN, NY
2011-06-20Moved bank headquarters from WYOMISSING, PA to WILMINGTON, DE
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2012-01-26Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS
2012-01-26Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK
2012-01-26Changed name to Sovereign Bank, National Association
2013-10-17Changed name to Santander Bank, N.A.