Home > Safra National Bank of New York > History
Safra National Bank of New York, History
The following are major historical events for Safra National Bank of New York, including mergers and acquisitions.
1987-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Safra National Bank of New York | |
1997-01-01 | Acquired United Mizrahi Bank and Trust Company (22645) in NEW YORK, NY | |
2000-01-01 | Acquired Skylake National Bank (20562) in MIAMI, FL | |
2001-03-08 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW YORK CITY, NY to NEW YORK, NY | |
2023-10-01 | Acquired Delta National Bank and Trust CompanySafra National Bank of New York (26633) in NEW YORK, NY. |