Home > Sabine State Bank and Trust Company > History
Sabine State Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Sabine State Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Sabine State Bank and Trust Company | |
1996-06-07 | Acquired First Community Bank (19231) in WINNFIELD, LA | |
2001-01-01 | Acquired Bank of Saline (8802) in SALINE, LA | |
2002-06-17 | Acquired Community Bank, Katy, Tx. (24736) in HEMPHILL, TX | |
2002-12-17 | Acquired The Farmers Bank & Trust of Cheneyville (16445) in CHENEYVILLE, LA as part of a government assisted transaction. |