Home > Royal Banks of Missouri > History
Royal Banks of Missouri, History
The following are major historical events for Royal Banks of Missouri, including mergers and acquisitions.
1965-11-08 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens Bank of University City | |
1982-04-13 | Changed name to Royal Bank Mid-County | |
1987-10-26 | Acquired Royal Bank-West Side National Association (19395) in GLENDALE, MO | |
1987-12-04 | Changed name to Royal Banks of Missouri | |
2016-07-09 | Acquired Frontenac Bank (34986) in EARTH CITY, MO | |
2021-07-30 | Moved bank headquarters from 8021 OLIVE BOULEVARD, UNIVERSITY CITY, MO to 8021 Olive Blvd, University City, MO. | |
2021-07-30 | Acquired Saints Avenue BankRoyal Banks of Missouri (16170) in NEW LONDON, MO. |