Home > Rollstone Bank & Trust > History
Rollstone Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for Rollstone Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1846-02-12 | Institution established: Original name:Fitchburg Savings Bank | |
1983-04-15 | Changed name to Fitchburg Savings Bank, FSB | |
1983-04-15 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
1989-12-31 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1992-08-12 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2008-02-21 | Changed name to Rollstone Bank & Trust | |
2011-07-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |