Rockland Trust Company, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Rockland Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.

1907-09-10Institution established: Original name:Rockland Trust Company
1910-04-27Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANDFATHERED
1992-06-22Acquired Middleborough Trust Company (8155) in MIDDLEBORO, MA
2004-07-17Acquired Falmouth Co-operative Bank (26481) in FALMOUTH, MA
2008-03-01Acquired Slade's Ferry Trust Company (18085) in SOMERSET, MA
2009-05-09Acquired Benjamin Franklin Bank (90200) in FRANKLIN, MA
2012-11-10Acquired Central Co-operative Bank (26646) in SOMERVILLE, MA
2013-11-16Acquired Mayflower Co-operative Bank (26553) in MIDDLEBORO, MA
2015-02-21Acquired Peoples Federal Savings Bank (29861) in BRIGHTON, MA
2016-11-11Acquired Bank of Cape Cod (58270) in HYANNIS, MA
2017-05-12Acquired The Edgartown National Bank (2575) in EDGARTOWN, MA
2018-11-16Acquired The Milford National Bank and Trust Company (2615) in MILFORD, MA
2019-04-01Acquired Blue Hills Bank (90160) in BOSTON, MA