Home > RiverWood Bank > History
RiverWood Bank, History
The following are major historical events for RiverWood Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Bemidji | |
1989-01-31 | Changed name to First Federal Banking and Savings, FA | |
1994-10-17 | Changed name to First Federal Banking & Savings, FSB | |
1994-10-17 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1995-04-03 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1997-08-18 | Changed name to First Federal Bank | |
2008-08-25 | Changed name to RiverWood Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2013-02-22 | Acquired RiverWood Bank (31063) in BAXTER, MN | |
2017-02-23 | Moved bank headquarters from BEMIDJI, MN to BAXTER, MN |