Home > Riverstone Bank > History
Riverstone Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Riverstone Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1884-09-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Talmage | |
2007-09-01 | Changed name to Tri Valley Bank | |
2020-09-30 | Acquired Eagle State Bank (21809) in EAGLE, NE | |
2021-01-12 | Changed name to Riverstone Bank. | |
2021-08-16 | Moved bank headquarters from 600 S 4th St, Eagle, NE to 600 S 4th St, Eagle, NE. | |
2021-11-05 | Change trust powers from Full to Full. | |
2021-11-05 | Acquired First State BankRiverstone Bank (15586) in SCOTTSBLUFF, NE. |