Rio Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Rio Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1985-02-11 | Institution established: Original name:Rio National Bank | |
2002-06-03 | Changed name to Rio Bank | |
2002-06-03 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2002-06-03 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2004-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
2016-04-28 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2018-08-31 | Acquired Elsa State Bank and Trust Company (16239) in ELSA, TX |