Home > Republic Bank of Chicago > History
Republic Bank of Chicago, History
The following are major historical events for Republic Bank of Chicago, including mergers and acquisitions.
1964-12-01 | Institution established: Original name:Republic Bank of Chicago | |
1994-08-17 | Moved bank headquarters from CHICAGO, IL to DARIEN, IL | |
1994-08-18 | Acquired First Cook Community Bank, F.S.B. (29752) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2008-05-07 | Moved bank headquarters from DARIEN, IL to OAK BROOK, IL | |
2009-01-16 | Acquired National Bank of Commerce (19733) in BERKELEY, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2009-06-05 | Acquired Bank of Lincolnwood (17309) in LINCOLNWOOD, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2009-09-01 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2010-04-23 | Acquired Citizens Bank and Trust Company of Chicago (34658) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2014-01-17 | Acquired DuPage National Bank (5732) in WEST CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2014-05-16 | Acquired AztecAmerica Bank (57866) in BERWYN, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2015-05-08 | Acquired Edgebrook Bank (57772) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2017-10-18 | Reorganized. |