Home > Renasant Bank > History

Renasant Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Renasant Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1904-02-27Institution established: Original name:The Peoples Bank and Trust Company
1974-09-13Acquired Clay County Bank and Trust Company (20887) in WEST POINT, MS
1975-12-01Acquired Bank of Pontotoc (9785) in PONTOTOC, MS
1980-06-03Acquired Bank of Amory (8241) in AMORY, MS
1984-07-03Acquired Panola County Bank (11429) in SARDIS, MS
1984-09-01Acquired Alcorn Bank and Trust Company (22423) in CORINTH, MS
1985-07-01Acquired Merchants & Farmers Bank of Winona (16844) in WINONA, MS
1988-01-01Acquired Bank of Water Valley (12205) in WATER VALLEY, MS
1994-12-31Acquired New South Bank (29391) in BATESVILLE, MS
1999-03-26Acquired Inter-City Federal Savings Bank (28853) in LOUISVILLE, MS
2005-01-01Acquired Heritage Bank (34015) in DECATUR, AL
2005-02-01Changed name to Renasant Bank
2005-03-31Acquired Renasant Bank of Tennessee (35132) in GERMANTOWN, TN
2007-07-01Acquired Capital Bank & Trust Company (33902) in NASHVILLE, TN
2010-07-23Acquired Crescent Bank and Trust Company (27559) in JASPER, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-02-04Acquired American Trust Bank (57432) in ROSWELL, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-09-01Reorganized.
2013-09-01Acquired Merchants and Farmers Bank (9361) in KOSCIUSKO, MS
2015-07-01Acquired Heritage Bank of the South (50028) in ALBANY, GA
2016-04-01Acquired KeyWorth Bank (58617) in JOHNS CREEK, GA
2017-07-01Acquired Metropolitan Bank (22346) in CRYSTAL SPRINGS, MS