Home > Relyance Bank > History
Relyance Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Relyance Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1965-02-11 | Institution established: Original name:PINE BLUFF NATIONAL BANK | |
1972-07-05 | Changed name to Pine Bluff National Bank | |
1995-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
1997-04-01 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2013-05-31 | Changed name to Relyance Bank, National Association | |
2013-12-06 | Acquired Hot Springs Bank & Trust Company (3855) in HOT SPRINGS, AR | |
2022-07-05 | Moved bank headquarters from 8500 Sheridan Rd, WHITE HALL, AR to 8500 Sheridan Rd, WHITE HALL, AR. | |
2022-10-21 | Changed name to Relyance Bank. | |
2022-10-21 | Changed Chartering Agency to OCC. | |
2022-10-21 | Changed Bank Class to SM. | |
2022-10-21 | Changed Primary Federal Regulatory Agency from FED to FED. |