Home > Regions Bank > History

Regions Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Regions Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1928-01-01Institution established: Original name:Exchange Bank
1957-04-02Changed name to Exchange-Security Bank
1975-01-31Changed name to First Alabama Bank of Birmingham
1984-06-04Changed name to First Alabama Bank
1985-03-22Moved bank headquarters from BIRMINGHAM, AL to MONTGOMERY, AL
1985-03-22Acquired First Alabama Bank of Montgomery, N. A. (2816) in MONTGOMERY, AL
1985-03-22Acquired First Alabama Bank of Huntsville, N. A. (2806) in HUNTSVILLE, AL
1985-05-25Acquired First Alabama Bank of Hartselle (19455) in HARTSELLE, AL
1985-05-25Acquired First Alabama Bank of Guntersville (78) in GUNTERSVILLE, AL
1985-05-25Acquired First Alabama Bank of Walker County (71) in CORDOVA, AL
1985-06-08Acquired First Alabama Bank of Talladega County, N.A. (2833) in TALLADEGA, AL
1985-06-08Acquired First Alabama Bank of Anniston, National Association (2775) in ANNISTON, AL
1985-06-08Acquired First Alabama Bank of Gadsden, N. A. (19370) in GADSDEN, AL
1985-06-15Acquired First Alabama Bank of South Baldwin (12069) in FOLEY, AL
1985-06-15Acquired First Alabama Bank of Conecuh County (17397) in EVERGREEN, AL
1985-06-15Acquired First Alabama Bank of Baldwin County, N. A. (17367) in BAY MINETTE, AL
1985-06-22Acquired First Alabama Bank of Sumter County (5611) in LIVINGSTON, AL
1985-09-21Acquired First Alabama Bank of Chilton County (66) in THORSBY, AL
1985-10-12Acquired First Alabama Bank of Phenix City, N. A. (18686) in PHENIX CITY, AL
1985-10-26Acquired First Alabama Bank of Lee County, N.A. (22603) in OPELIKA, AL
1985-11-09Acquired First Alabama Bank of Troy, National Association (2834) in TROY, AL
1985-11-16Acquired First Alabama Bank of Selma, N. A. (2826) in SELMA, AL
1985-11-23Acquired First Alabama Bank of Cullman (21504) in CULLMAN, AL
1985-12-07Acquired First Alabama Bank of Lauderdale County (1741) in ROGERSVILLE, AL
1985-12-14Acquired First Alabama Bank of Athens, N. A. (75) in ATHENS, AL
1986-02-15Acquired First Alabama Bank of Mobile, National Assoication (20322) in MOBILE, AL
1986-04-19Acquired First Alabama Bank of Dothan (854) in DOTHAN, AL
1986-05-17Acquired First Alabama Bank of Tuscaloosa, N. A. (2836) in TUSCALOOSA, AL
1986-08-25Acquired First State Bank of Alabama (19533) in DECATUR, AL
1986-09-29Acquired Shelby State Bank (20751) in PELHAM, AL
1986-12-13Acquired First Citizens Bank of Alabama (1734) in ONEONTA, AL
1987-04-04Acquired Enterprise Banking Company (16373) in ENTERPRISE, AL
1987-10-23Reorganized.
1987-10-23Acquired The Albertville National Bank (2772) in PRATTVILLE, AL
1988-04-08Acquired The Choctaw Bank of Butler (9052) in BUTLER, AL
1988-06-18Acquired First Alabama Bank of Covington County (55) in ANDALUSIA, AL
1990-08-10Acquired Baldwin County Federal Savings Bank (28071) in ROBERTSDALE, AL
1990-09-14Acquired City Federal Savings and Loan Association (30202) in BIRMINGHAM, AL
1994-07-08Acquired The First Bank of Fayette (2796) in FAYETTE, AL
1995-01-20Acquired Union Bank & Trust Company (5601) in MONTGOMERY, AL
1996-06-10Moved bank headquarters from MONTGOMERY, AL to BIRMINGHAM, AL
1996-11-12Changed name to Regions Bank
1997-08-09Acquired Regions Bank of Georgia (33473) in COLUMBUS, GA
1997-08-09Acquired Regions Bank of Tennessee (33764) in NASHVILLE, TN
1997-09-26Acquired Regions Bank of Florida (18114) in PENSACOLA, FL
1997-11-07Acquired Regions Bank, National Association (27366) in LONGWOOD, FL
1997-12-31Acquired Regions Bank of Louisiana (28098) in BATON ROUGE, LA
1998-02-02Acquired Regions Bank (26976) in GAINESVILLE, GA
1998-02-06Acquired The Bank of Millen (880) in MILLEN, GA
1998-02-06Acquired Bank of Morgan County (168) in MADISON, GA
1998-03-13Acquired First Bank of Georgia (27200) in EAST POINT, GA
1998-03-13Acquired Smyrna Bank & Trust Company (26470) in SMYRNA, GA
1998-03-23Acquired Allied Bank of Georgia (163) in THOMSON, GA
1998-04-13Acquired Regions Bank, FSB (31219) in GRIFFIN, GA
1998-04-24Acquired First State Bank & Trust Company (15948) in ALBANY, GA
1998-04-29Acquired First State Bank and Trust Company in Cordele (15635) in CORDELE, GA
1998-05-11Acquired Regions Bank, National Association (27340) in SPARTANBURG, SC
1998-05-11Acquired Regions Bank, National Association (25244) in ANDERSON, SC
1998-06-20Acquired The New Iberia Bank (4294) in NEW IBERIA, LA
1998-07-23Acquired Palmetto Federal Savings Bank of South Carolina (30524) in AIKEN, SC
1998-08-13Acquired Citizens First Bank (95) in EL DORADO, AR
1998-08-13Acquired First Commercial Bank, National Association of Memphis (28910) in MEMPHIS, TN
1998-08-27Acquired State First National Bank (22695) in TEXARKANA, TX
1998-08-27Acquired State First National Bank (3894) in TEXARKANA, AR
1998-09-10Acquired The Stone Fort National Bank of Nacogdoches (3357) in NACOGDOCHES, TX
1998-09-10Acquired Kilgore First National Bank (3284) in KILGORE, TX
1998-09-10Acquired Tyler Bank and Trust, National Association (33780) in TYLER, TX
1998-09-10Acquired The First National Bank of Palestine (3378) in PALESTINE, TX
1998-09-10Acquired Longview National Bank (3310) in LONGVIEW, TX
1998-09-10Acquired Lufkin National Bank (33779) in LUFKIN, TX
1998-09-18Acquired First Commercial Trust Company, National Association (33377) in LITTLE ROCK, AR
1998-09-24Acquired First Commercial Bank, Rogers (17678) in ROGERS, AR
1998-09-24Acquired Arkansas State Bank (19732) in CLARKSVILLE, AR
1998-09-24Acquired The Security Bank (83) in HARRISON, AR
1998-10-09Acquired First National Bank of Russellville (1033) in RUSSELLVILLE, AR
1998-10-09Acquired Clinton State Bank (16520) in CLINTON, AR
1998-10-09Acquired Morrilton Security Bank, National Association (25232) in MORRILTON, AR
1998-10-09Acquired The First National Bank of Conway (3856) in CONWAY, AR
1998-10-22Acquired Benton State Bank (13934) in BENTON, AR
1998-10-22Acquired Arkansas Bank and Trust Company (97) in HOT SPRINGS, AR
1998-10-22Acquired Citizens First Bank (3852) in ARKADELPHIA, AR
1998-10-22Acquired Citizens First Bank (3862) in FORDYCE, AR
1998-11-05Acquired First Commercial Bank, National Association (13739) in LITTLE ROCK, AR
1998-11-19Acquired Springhill Bank & Trust Company (15943) in SPRINGHILL, LA
1998-11-20Acquired The First National Bank of Nashville (3884) in NASHVILLE, AR
1998-11-20Acquired First National Bank (15944) in SEARCY, AR
1998-12-03Acquired First Bank of Arkansas (18639) in JONESBORO, AR
1999-03-26Acquired Valdosta Bank and Trust (33027) in VALDOSTA, GA
1999-03-26Acquired Greenville National Bank (25015) in GREENVILLE, SC
1999-04-23Acquired Etowah Bank (10071) in CANTON, GA
1999-06-25Acquired Fayette County Bank (32706) in PEACHTREE CITY, GA
1999-06-25Acquired The Bank of Newnan (27097) in NEWNAN, GA
1999-07-16Acquired The Village Bank of Florida (26214) in TAMPA, FL
1999-07-16Acquired The St. Mary Bank and Trust Company (10525) in FRANKLIN, LA
1999-09-10Acquired The Arkansas Bank (11251) in WALNUT RIDGE, AR
1999-09-10Acquired The Planters Bank (16155) in OSCEOLA, AR
1999-09-10Acquired The Arkansas Bank National Association (33577) in BATESVILLE, AR
1999-09-10Acquired The Arkansas Bank (1290) in JONESBORO, AR
1999-10-08Acquired Regions Bank, National Association (27436) in BRADENTON, FL
1999-10-08Acquired St. James Bank & Trust Company (1375) in LUTCHER, LA
1999-11-05Acquired Jacobs Bank (45) in SCOTTSBORO, AL
1999-11-05Acquired Meigs County Bank (6094) in DECATUR, TN
2000-05-09Acquired Bank of Huntland (4937) in HUNTLAND, TN
2000-05-09Acquired Lincoln County Bank (13658) in FAYETTEVILLE, TN
2000-06-23Acquired Minden Bank & Trust Company (13659) in MINDEN, LA
2000-09-08Acquired Security First National Bank (8806) in ALEXANDRIA, LA
2000-10-13Acquired Bank at Ormond-By-The-Sea (21269) in VOLUSIA COUNTY, FL
2000-11-10Acquired Texas Heritage Bank (26637) in HUTTO, TX
2001-07-10Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2001-07-10Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
2002-03-08Acquired Park Meridian Bank (33480) in CHARLOTTE, NC
2002-04-05Acquired First Bank of Texas (23883) in TOMBALL, TX
2002-05-17Acquired Independence Bank, National Association (24939) in HARRIS COUNTY, TX
2002-07-12Acquired Brookhollow National Bank (20577) in DALLAS, TX
2005-06-30Acquired Union Planters Bank, National Association (4979) in MEMPHIS, TN
2005-09-29Acquired Regions Morgan Keegan Trust, F.S.B. (35162) in BIRMINGHAM, AL
2006-11-04Acquired AmSouth Bank (26800) in BIRMINGHAM, AL
2007-11-30Reorganized.
2008-08-29Acquired Integrity Bank (35469) in ALPHARETTA, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06Acquired FirstBank Financial Services (57017) in MCDONOUGH, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.