Home > Regional Missouri Bank > History
Regional Missouri Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Regional Missouri Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1908-05-13 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Bynumville | |
1978-09-25 | Changed name to Regional Missouri Bank | |
1982-09-07 | Moved bank headquarters from BYNUMVILLE, MO to MARCELINE, MO | |
2000-06-09 | Acquired Marceline Home Savings and Loan Association (29989) in MARCELINE, MO | |
2012-07-13 | Acquired Glasgow Savings Bank (1056) in GLASGOW, MO as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2019-10-01 | Acquired Bank of Cairo and Moberly (8254) in MOBERLY, MO |