Home > Regent Bank > History
Regent Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Regent Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1898-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Nowata | |
1997-03-13 | Changed name to The First National Bank & Trust Company | |
2003-04-14 | Changed name to Regent Bank & Trust Company, National Association | |
2008-05-19 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2008-05-19 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2008-05-19 | Changed name to Regent Bank | |
2016-06-30 | Moved bank headquarters from NOWATA, OK to TULSA, OK |