Home > Raymond James Bank > History
Raymond James Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Raymond James Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1994-05-06 | Institution established: Original name:Raymond James Bank, FSB | |
1994-07-26 | Moved bank headquarters from HUDSON, FL to SPRING HILL, FL | |
1998-05-08 | Moved bank headquarters from SPRING HILL, FL to SAINT PETERSBURG, FL | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2012-02-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2012-02-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2012-02-01 | Changed name to Raymond James Bank, National Association | |
2021-06-01 | Changed name to Raymond James Bank. | |
2021-06-01 | Changed Chartering Agency to OCC. | |
2021-06-01 | Changed Bank Class to SM. | |
2021-06-01 | Changed Primary Federal Regulatory Agency from FED to FED. |