Home > Range Bank > History
Range Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Range Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1887-06-04 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Negaunee | |
1986-07-31 | Reorganized. | |
2005-12-01 | Changed name to Range Bank, National Association | |
2006-12-15 | Acquired Range Bank - Copper Country, National Association (5065) in CALUMET, MI | |
2014-10-14 | Moved bank headquarters from NEGAUNEE, MI to MARQUETTE, MI | |
2021-06-30 | Changed name to Range Bank. | |
2021-06-30 | Changed Chartering Agency to OCC. | |
2021-06-30 | Changed Bank Class to NM. | |
2021-06-30 | Changed Primary Federal Regulatory Agency from FDIC to FDIC. | |
2021-06-30 | Institution withdraws from membership in the Federal Reserve System. |