Home > Queensborough National Bank & Trust Company > History
Queensborough National Bank & Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Queensborough National Bank & Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Louisville | |
1985-11-30 | Reorganized. | |
1986-12-31 | Acquired Bank of Midville (16263) in MIDVILLE, GA | |
1988-02-01 | Changed name to The First National Bank & Trust Company | |
1996-01-05 | Moved bank headquarters from LOUISVILLE, GA to TENNILLE, GA | |
1999-03-01 | Moved bank headquarters from TENNILLE, GA to LOUISVILLE, GA | |
1999-03-01 | Acquired Ogeechee Valley Bank (21393) in MILLEN, GA | |
1999-03-01 | Acquired Bank of Wadley (194) in WADLEY, GA | |
2006-01-01 | Changed name to Queensborough National Bank & Trust Company |