Home > Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B. > History
Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B., History
The following are major historical events for Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B., including mergers and acquisitions.
1956-07-02 | Institution established: Original name:Provident Federal Savings Bank | |
1982-08-31 | Acquired Colorado River Federal Savings and Loan Association (31510) in BLYTHE, CA | |
1989-02-28 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS & LOAN | |
1989-02-28 | Changed name to Provident Savings Bank | |
1990-06-30 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1990-06-30 | Changed name to Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B. | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |