Home > Provident Bank > History
Provident Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Provident Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1839-02-28 | Institution established: Original name:The Provident Institution for Savings in Jersey City | |
1970-02-02 | Changed name to Provident Savings Bank | |
1977-12-30 | Acquired The First National Bank of Dunellen (6329) in DUNELLEN, NJ | |
1983-02-19 | Acquired Bloomfield Savings Bank (16141) in BLOOMFIELD, NJ | |
1991-07-26 | Acquired Suburban National Bank (27157) in HILLSBOROUGH, NJ | |
1991-08-16 | Acquired Mutual Aid Federal Savings and Loan Association (33038) in MANASQUAN, NJ | |
1998-12-23 | Acquired Monarch Bank, FSB (30213) in KEARNY, NJ | |
2000-12-11 | Changed name to The Provident Bank | |
2003-01-15 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2004-07-14 | Acquired First Savings Bank (30255) in WOODBRIDGE, NJ | |
2007-04-01 | Acquired First Morris Bank and Trust (19975) in MORRIS TOWNSHIP, NJ | |
2014-05-31 | Acquired Team Capital Bank (58085) in BETHLEHEM, PA | |
2016-10-01 | Changed name to Provident Bank | |
2020-07-31 | Acquired SB One Bank (22221) in FRANKLIN, NJ |