Home > PriorityOne Bank > History
PriorityOne Bank, History
The following are major historical events for PriorityOne Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1975-01-27 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Simpson County | |
1982-08-05 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1989-02-28 | Acquired State Bank and Trust Company (8549) in COLLINS, MS | |
1993-06-01 | Changed name to Citizens State Bank | |
1994-07-01 | Acquired Citizens Bank and Trust Company (21593) in MORTON, MS | |
2003-03-01 | Changed name to PriorityOne Bank |