Home > Prevail Bank > History
Prevail Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Prevail Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1935-02-18 | Institution established: Original name:Time F Savings and Loan A | |
1989-05-31 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1989-05-31 | Changed name to Time Federal Savings Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2019-11-01 | Acquired River Cities Bank (34304) in WISCONSIN RAPIDS, WI | |
2020-02-24 | Changed name to Prevail Bank |