Home > PremierBank > History
PremierBank, History
The following are major historical events for PremierBank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1863-10-27 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Fort Atkinson | |
1975-11-28 | Changed name to First American Bank & Trust Co. | |
1999-01-01 | Acquired Jefferson County Bank (10006) in JEFFERSON, WI | |
1999-02-01 | Changed name to Premier Bank | |
2003-11-14 | Changed name to PremierBank | |
2017-09-22 | Acquired Commercial Bank (12518) in WHITEWATER, WI |