Home > Premier Bank > History
Premier Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Premier Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1920-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1993-07-19 | Changed name to First Federal Savings and Loan, a stock savings and loan | |
1993-07-19 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
1998-09-04 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2000-01-01 | Changed name to First Federal Bank of the Midwest | |
2005-01-21 | Acquired The Commercial Bank (750) in DELPHOS, OH | |
2005-04-08 | Acquired Genoa Savings and Loan Company (27810) in GENOA, OH | |
2008-03-14 | Acquired Bank of Lenawee (971) in ADRIAN, MI | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2017-02-24 | Acquired The Commercial Savings Bank (2291) in UPPER SANDUSKY, OH | |
2020-01-31 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2020-01-31 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2020-01-31 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2020-01-31 | Acquired Home Savings Bank (35385) in YOUNGSTOWN, OH | |
2020-01-31 | Moved bank headquarters from DEFIANCE, OH to YOUNGSTOWN, OH | |
2020-06-19 | Changed name to Premier Bank |