Home > Peoples Security Bank and Trust Company > History
Peoples Security Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Peoples Security Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1905-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Hallstead | |
1965-02-19 | Changed name to Peoples National Bank of Susquehanna County | |
1986-07-01 | Changed name to Peoples National Bank of Susquehanna | |
1986-07-01 | Reorganized. | |
2001-06-06 | Changed name to Peoples National Bank | |
2010-12-13 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2010-12-13 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2010-12-13 | Changed name to Peoples Neighborhood Bank | |
2013-10-23 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2013-12-01 | Acquired Penn Security Bank and Trust Company (463) in SCRANTON, PA | |
2013-12-01 | Changed name to Peoples Security Bank and Trust Company | |
2013-12-01 | Moved bank headquarters from HALLSTEAD, PA to SCRANTON, PA |