Home > Peoples Bank of Kankakee County > History
Peoples Bank of Kankakee County, History
The following are major historical events for Peoples Bank of Kankakee County, including mergers and acquisitions.
1962-06-20 | Institution established: Original name:Peoples Bank Marycrest | |
1980-04-08 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1990-09-10 | Moved bank headquarters from KANKAKEE, IL to BRADLEY, IL | |
1990-09-14 | Acquired Crest Federal Savings and Loan Association (32831) in KANKAKEE, IL | |
1992-01-01 | Changed name to Peoples Bank of Kankakee County | |
1992-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from BRADLEY, IL to BOURBONNAIS, IL | |
1993-04-27 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED |