Home > Peoples Bank of Alabama > History
Peoples Bank of Alabama, History
The following are major historical events for Peoples Bank of Alabama, including mergers and acquisitions.
1977-10-24 | Institution established: Original name:Peoples Bank of Holly Pond | |
1983-09-30 | Changed name to Peoples Bank of Cullman County | |
1985-05-17 | Moved bank headquarters from HOLLY POND, AL to CULLMAN, AL | |
1987-03-31 | Reorganized. | |
1994-05-20 | Changed name to Peoples Bank of North Alabama | |
1997-01-06 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2008-08-21 | Changed name to Peoples Bank of Alabama | |
2014-08-18 | Acquired Generations Bank (58842) in CENTRE, AL |