Home > Peoples Bank > History
Peoples Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Peoples Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1945-06-01 | Institution established: Original name:Lester State Bank | |
1977-05-09 | Changed name to Peoples Bank and Trust | |
1977-05-09 | Moved bank headquarters from LESTER, IA to ROCK VALLEY, IA | |
1999-02-08 | Changed name to Peoples Bank | |
1999-02-08 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1999-02-08 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
2002-05-23 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2002-05-23 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2002-05-23 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2006-03-10 | Acquired Jasper State Bank (10563) in JASPER, MN | |
2008-01-10 | Acquired Farmers State Bank (227) in HAWARDEN, IA | |
2018-08-01 | Acquired Pinnacle Bank Sioux City (18958) in SIOUX CITY, IA |