Home > Peapack Private Bank & Trust > History
Peapack Private Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for Peapack Private Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1921-09-21 | Institution established: Original name:Peapack-Gladstone Bank | |
1943-02-09 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1943-02-09 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2000-01-08 | Acquired Chatham Savings, FSB (31425) in CHATHAM, NJ | |
2010-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from GLADSTONE, NJ to BEDMINSTER, NJ | |
2025-01-01 | Changed name to Peapack Private Bank & Trust. |