Home > Patriots Bank > History
Patriots Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Patriots Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1899-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Parker State Bank | |
1964-03-21 | Changed name to Kansas State Bank | |
1964-03-21 | Moved bank headquarters from PARKER, KS to GARNETT, KS | |
1986-08-12 | Acquired State Bank of Westphalia (15603) in WESTPHALIA, KS | |
1993-01-13 | Acquired Peoples Bank of Kansas (4764) in RICHMOND, KS | |
2002-08-02 | Changed name to Patriots Bank |