Home > Pan American Bank & Trust > History
Pan American Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for Pan American Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1995-12-22 | Institution established: Original name:Pan American Bank | |
2012-11-15 | Moved bank headquarters from CHICAGO, IL to MELROSE PARK, IL | |
2014-08-29 | Acquired Bank of Palatine (21971) in PALATINE, IL | |
2016-08-02 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2016-09-16 | Changed name to Pan American Bank & Trust |