Home > Orrstown Bank > History
Orrstown Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Orrstown Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1919-05-01 | Institution established: Original name:Orrstown Bank | |
1984-08-24 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2002-06-28 | Moved bank headquarters from ORRSTOWN, PA to SHIPPENSBURG, PA | |
2007-06-16 | Acquired The First National Bank of Newport (7656) in NEWPORT, PA | |
2018-10-01 | Acquired First Community Bank of Mercersburg (7609) in MERCERSBURG, PA | |
2019-05-01 | Acquired Hamilton Bank (28589) in TOWSON, MD |