One Bank of Tennessee, History

The following are a list of major historical events for One Bank of Tennessee, including mergers and acquisitions.

1901-11-01Institution established: Original name:Bank of Monterey
1975-11-19Changed name to Bank of Putnam County
1977-07-02Acquired Bank of Cookeville (19857) in COOKEVILLE, TN
1977-10-01Moved bank headquarters from MONTEREY, TN to COOKEVILLE, TN
2016-04-29Acquired Cumberland County Bank (18364) in CROSSVILLE, TN
2019-10-12Acquired Citizens First Bank (34311) in WARTBURG, TN
2020-06-01Changed name to One Bank of Tennessee