Home > Old National Bank > History
Old National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Old National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-08-27 | Institution established: Original name:The Peoples National Bank of St. Francisville | |
1938-07-29 | Changed name to The Peoples National Bank in Lawrenceville | |
1988-05-31 | Reorganized. | |
1999-11-04 | Changed name to Old National Bank | |
1999-11-04 | Acquired ONB Bloomington, National Association (30172) in BLOOMINGTON, IN | |
1999-11-05 | Acquired Old National Bank (4393) in EVANSVILLE, IN | |
2000-07-27 | Acquired Permanent Bank (27747) in EVANSVILLE, IN | |
2000-08-17 | Acquired The Farmers State Bank of Union City (10661) in UNION CITY, OH | |
2000-08-17 | Acquired American National Bank and Trust Company of Muncie (13085) in MUNCIE, IN | |
2000-08-17 | Moved bank headquarters from LAWRENCEVILLE, IL to EVANSVILLE, IN | |
2000-08-17 | Acquired Peoples Loan & Trust Bank (12846) in WINCHESTER, IN | |
2000-10-12 | Acquired First National Bank and Trust Company, Carbondale, Illinois (3772) in CARBONDALE, IL | |
2000-10-12 | Acquired Heritage Bank (27535) in CLARKSVILLE, TN | |
2001-03-08 | Acquired Orange County Bank (204) in PAOLI, IN | |
2007-02-02 | Acquired St. Joseph Capital Bank (34324) in MISHAWAKA, IN | |
2011-01-01 | Acquired Monroe Bank (12847) in BLOOMINGTON, IN | |
2011-07-29 | Acquired Integra Bank National Association (4392) in EVANSVILLE, IN as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2012-09-15 | Acquired Indiana Bank and Trust Company (28285) in COLUMBUS, IN | |
2013-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
2014-04-26 | Acquired Tower Bank & Trust Company (35040) in FORT WAYNE, IN | |
2014-08-01 | Acquired Old National Trust Company (33001) in MUNCIE, IN | |
2014-08-01 | Acquired United Bank & Trust (13177) in ANN ARBOR, MI | |
2014-11-01 | Acquired Lafayette Savings Bank, FSB (11990) in LAFAYETTE, IN | |
2015-01-01 | Acquired Founders Bank & Trust (33533) in GRAND RAPIDS, MI | |
2016-05-01 | Acquired AnchorBank, fsb (29979) in MADISON, WI | |
2017-11-01 | Acquired Anchor Bank, National Association (8868) in SAINT PAUL, MN | |
2018-11-01 | Acquired KleinBank (1414) in CHASKA, MN |