Home > Oconee Federal Savings and Loan Association > History
Oconee Federal Savings and Loan Association, History
The following are major historical events for Oconee Federal Savings and Loan Association, including mergers and acquisitions.
1924-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Oconee Savings and Loan Association | |
1991-10-21 | Changed name to Oconee Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2014-12-01 | Acquired Stephens Federal Bank (29511) in TOCCOA, GA | |
2024-01-31 | Acquired Mutual Savings BankOconee Federal Savings and Loan Association (29999) in HARTSVILLE, SC. |