Home > Northeast Security Bank > History
Northeast Security Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Northeast Security Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1888-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First State Bank | |
1984-04-02 | Changed name to Northeast Iowa National Bank | |
1985-08-01 | Moved bank headquarters from FREDERICKSBURG, IA to SUMNER, IA | |
1992-07-01 | Changed name to Northeast Security Bank | |
2008-04-01 | Acquired Fairbank State Bank (8754) in FAIRBANK, IA | |
2018-03-19 | Acquired Security State Bank (15851) in INDEPENDENCE, IA | |
2021-03-26 | Acquired First State BankNortheast Security Bank (11634) in SUMNER, IA. |