Home > Northbrook Bank and Trust Company > History
Northbrook Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Northbrook Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
2000-11-22 | Institution established: Original name:Northbrook Bank and Trust Company | |
2010-04-23 | Acquired Lincoln Park Savings Bank (30600) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-08-06 | Acquired Ravenswood Bank (34231) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-02-04 | Acquired Community First Bank - Chicago (57948) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-07-08 | Acquired First Chicago Bank & Trust (27935) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2019-10-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2019-10-01 | Changed name to Northbrook Bank and Trust Company, National Association | |
2019-10-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |