Home > North Valley Bank > History
North Valley Bank, History
The following are major historical events for North Valley Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1904-11-04 | Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Corning Company | |
1944-08-02 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1944-08-02 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1998-10-01 | Changed name to North Valley Bank | |
2000-06-05 | Moved bank headquarters from CORNING, OH to ZANESVILLE, OH | |
2001-05-03 | Acquired The Malta National Bank (6629) in MALTA, OH as part of a government assisted transaction. |